Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Arcadia Resources Inc, filed a(n) Civil case against National Home Medical Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCook, J.. Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED FINANCIAL HISTORY Fund Account Date Invoice Interface Amount GLActivity Description MD2495 MD3777 04/25/2012 I0379624 325117 ______100.00 Debit ARCADIA RESOURCES INC |
|
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File being sent to R/C for disposal; boxed 6/13/13 in R/C pick-up area. |
|
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING GOOD CAUSE THIS MATTER SHALL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT OF GARNISHEE | |
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REFUND MONEY FROM REGISTRY |
|
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
March 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.