Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Murray Morin And Herman P A, filed a(n) Civil case against Marin, Ana Maria, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsom, R. Claudia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED FINANCIAL HISTORY Fund Date Invoice Interface Amount GLActivity Description C00598 12/30/2009 _______ F0002964 ___123717.00 Credit 09-CA-032153 C00598 12/30/2009 _______ J0000206 ________1.35 Credit Investment P Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER RELEASING FUNDS FROM THE COURT REGISTRY- 4/30/14 CRI Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED MOTION TO - FOR JOINT / RELEASE FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING REOPEN FEE
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
JOINT MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED $50 FEE ASSESSED
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE THE COURT'S NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND MOTION TO CLOSE CASE / EXHIBITS ATCHD Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.