Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
At & T Advertising & Publishing, Bellsouth Advertising & Publishing Corp, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Tampa Bay Lock & Key Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Barbas, Rex presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbas, Rex Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: November 13, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
PAPER CASE FILE DESTROYED - DIGITIZED Paper document converted to electronic image(s) destroyed per requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.525(c)(2)(B); (c)(2)(F); and (c)(4) Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC--- IMAGED FILE
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL WITH DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO CHANGE ADDRESS Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/10/15 AT 11:45 AM Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT DEFENDANT / IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR ORDER ON EX-PARTE MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING 1. GRANTED. 2. PLAINTIFF SHALL APPEAR BIA TELEPHONE ON TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 10,2015: 3. THE MATTER BEFORE THE COURT MAY BE HEARD AND RESOLVED BY THE COURT WITHIN FIFTEEN (15)MINUTES.. JUDGE R Judge: Barbas, Rex |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTITLEMENT & CLAIM FOR ATTY FEES AND/OR COSTS Judge: Barbas, Rex |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.