Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Roe, Johnnie, Roe, Terry, Roe, Viola, Dept Of Housing And Urban Development400 N Tampa St Ste 3200, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Wolfe, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS JESSICA FAGEN. USER ID=KANTAKDE Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK RE: RETN OF ORIG DOCS. USER ID=WAGNERC Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER ORIGINAL NOTE MAILED TO: JESSICA FAGEN BEN-EZRA & KATZ PA 2901 STIRLING RD STE 300 FT LAUDERDALE FL 33312 PER ORDER SIGNED 09/27/10 MJC. USER ID=WAGNERC Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.