Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Civil case against Adwell, Christiane Adwell, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Bergmann, E. Charles presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE The new file is in the pick up area to be transported to the R/C... Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING
Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 27TH DAY OF AUGUST, 2014 AT 3PM Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 4/10/13 9AM Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING STATEMENTS, ATTACHED. USER ID=KANTAKDE Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS USER ID=AYALAY Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST USER ID=AYALAY Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT USER ID=AYALAY Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.