Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U.S.Bank National Association.Dept Foreclosure Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Green, Anthony, Green, Eleanor, Primus Automotive Financial Services Inc, Cheval West Community Assn Inc, Del Asset Holding Llc, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
X'D OUT NOT SIGNED BY JUDGE ORDER OF DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION - SET FOR CMC 60 DAYS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.