Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jp Morgan Chase Bank, National Association, Successor By Merger To Chase Home, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Macdill Federal Credit Union, Swenson, James A, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER GRANTING
Date: March 09, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISBURSE THIRD PARTY AND SURPLUS FUNDS --GRANTED 3/9/15 PAL Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED TO AN ELECTRONIC FILE Paper converted electronically and destroyed in accordance with minimum standards for image reproduction in Rules 1B-26.0021 and 1B-26.003, Florida Administrative Code and Record (master) copy requirements set forth in Section 92.29, Florida Statutes Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 3/9/15 @9:15AM - PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO DISBURSE THIRD PARTY AND SURPLUS FUNDS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING OF AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL ADVANCES Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL ADVANCES 2/16/15 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL ADVANCES Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR 1/13/15 PAL Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.