Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Derlyn Roberts-Glover, Millie-Ann Roberts, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Derlyn Roberts-Glover, Glenda Racine, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: July 22, 2010MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: March 27, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE AGREEMENT SIGNED (TOTAL RESOLUTION) Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT (DEFENDANT'S) Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR CONTINUE AND DIRECTING MEDIATION Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 10/28/16 @ 1 PM Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION OF CIRCUIT CIVIL ACTION Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/10/17 @ 9:30 AM Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL- Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.