Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Luna-Antonio, Caridad, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Pitcher, June Rose, Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Pendino, D. Sam presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File Transfer to R/C for storage; boxed 6/26/13 in R/C pick-up area. Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE NOT FOUND
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL GIVE FILE TO DONNA WATERS- VERIFY CLOSURE Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE FROM LUIS M BESSONE, ESQ Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED C0S 10/24/11 Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.