Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Palmavista Condo Assn Of Hillsborough County Inc, Home Equity Of America Inc, Jimenez, Adelina, Tampa Palms Owners Assn Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC AS PART OF FILE RELOCATION PROJECT Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO SET FOR TRIAL SEPTEMBER 10, 2012 8:30AM Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
October 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED ESTER GUTIERREZ 9/20/11. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
September 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED HCSO CK 555835. USER ID=HIPSON Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=CUSHMAN Judge: Levens, P. William |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.