Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Financial System Florida, Incc O Corporation Service Co, R.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mccray, Pamela I, Mccray, Shelly A, Panther Trace Villas Assn Inc, Panther Trace Ii Hoa Inc, Wachovia Bank Na, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Stephens, Scott. Steven presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in transit to the Record Center Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER ORIG NOTE MAILED TO: FLORIDA DEFAULT LAW GROUP PL P O BX 25018 TAMPA FL 33622-5018 PER ORD SIGNED 12/30/11 HB Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.