Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Caraballo, Benjamin, Caraballo, Tatiana, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED CARABALLO, BENJAMIN. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 11/12/2010 9:30 AM. USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED HCSO 914056. USER ID=HIPSON Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
October 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT ROPEN - CASE REOPENED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Levens, P. William |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.