Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Mortgage Services, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Providence Townhomes Hoa Inc, Evenson, Marty L, Quinta, Lauren, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER ORIGINAL NOTE ORIGINAL MORTGAGE 4/22/2010 RAF. USER ID=HUDSONAL Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
April 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND CANCELING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS 04/22/10 RAF. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
April 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE STEPHANIE LORD. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
April 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.