Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Fajardo, Alfonso Araujo, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Stephens, Scott. Steven presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 25, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT destruction Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. USER ID=TUCKERTO Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING USER ID=MCCLENDON Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.