Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Standard Insurance Co, Liberty Life Assurance Co Of Boston, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Peerless Insurance Co, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Harbor View Properties Inc, Callahan, Timothy J, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Arnold, D. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS COS 6/20/14 Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC file sent to rc Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE TO: TRENAM, KEMKER, SCHARF..., 101 EAST KENNEDY BLVD., SUITE 2700, TAMPA, FL 33602 (MOTION) PER ORDER SIGNED ON 06/13/14 BY JDA Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CIRCUIT CIVIL
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL FOR RETURN OF ORIG DOCS. PLEASE GIVE FILE TO STEPHANIE BAHOUR Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.