Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Teachers Ins And Annuity Assn Of America, filed a(n) Civil case against Grace Alexandria Holdings Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Arnold, D. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC File Returning to R/C; Boxed 8/1/13 in the R/C Pick-up area. |
|
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE NOT FOUND | |
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL Please check if you have the pleading Stipulation of Dismissal in this case. We have the file, but that pleading is not in it. Thank you! Rosie |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CIRCUIT CIVIL | |
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT | |
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL J. Heptner - redact |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. |
|
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.