Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
1900 Capital Trust Ii, By U.S. Bank Trust National Assocation, Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Certificate Trustee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, Oide, Jacqueline, Somerset Park Condo Assn Inc, Velez, Georgette, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: October 22, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS AMENDED Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON DEFTS OBJECTION TO SALE - OVERRULED - CLERK TO ISSUE TITLE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON HEARING SET ON OBJECTION TO SALE ON 7/7/16 AT 9:00 AM 6/23/16 ST Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO SALE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT GOOD FAITH DEP $1,620.00 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.