Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pano, Elijah C, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Friedman, Allison G, Friedman, Carol J, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Arnold, D. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION HEARING SCHEDULED 10/31/11 AT 3:00 PM. USER ID=STMARIAM Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE LEON & BERG PA. USER ID=DIGGSL Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT USER ID=DIGGSL Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
April 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES USER ID=BLACKMANJU Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE USER ID=BLACKMANJU Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.