Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citigroup Global Markets Realty Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, Santos, Miriam E, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Cook, J.. Martha presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT Destruction Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
July 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit civil new disposal in transit to the R/C Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL
Judge: Cook, J.. Martha |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.