Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fernandez, Nilsa, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Homewise Preferred Ins Co, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISS SETTLEMENT BEFORE HEARING ORDER RATIFYING STIP AND DISMISSING DEFT, HOMEWISE W/PREJ 07/25/11 JDA. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL W/PREJ AS TO DEFT, HOMEWISE PREFERRED INS CO. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO SET FOR TRIAL USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK LISA M. VISCO, ESQ. 777 S. HARGOUR ISLAND BOULEVARD, SUITE 500 TAMPA FL 33602 & N. BURTON WILLIAM, ESQ. 324 SOUTH HYDE PARK AVE. SUITE 275 TAMPA FL 33606. USER ID=BROWNSA Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO DISQUALIFY CASE REASSIGNED TO ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION ON JUDGE OWN INITIATIVE - DIVISION D 5/20/11 JDA. USER ID=BROWNSA Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
PRIVILEGE LOG USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.