Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, Reho, Giovanni, Fire Rock Llc, Reho, Cornelia, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Pendino, D. Sam presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT Destruction Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
August 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal is in transit to the Record Center. Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO LAW OFFICES OF MARSHALL C. WATSON, P.A. mas Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER Returned original Note to Law Offices of Marshall C. Watson, P.A. 5/17/12 SDP Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.