Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Keating, Sherry Lee, National City Bank, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED FINANCIAL HISTORY Fund Date Invoice Interface Amount GLActivity Description F08606 02/06/2013 _______ Y0000882 ___260000.00 Credit 09-CA-027570 F08606 03/15/2013 I0401308 344084 ___260000.00 Debit BANK OF N Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO REMOVE FROM PENDING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC File returning to R/C; Boxed and in pick-up area 7/26/13. Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CIRCUIT CIVIL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL Norman Winston - Div M - 7/25 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR REINSTATING FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE NUNC PRO TUNC TO 06/15/12 -MOTION GRANTED- ST 06/17/13 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING REINSTATING FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE NUNC PRO TUNC Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO - FOR REINSTATE JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC TO JUNE 15, 2012- EXHIBITS ATTACHED Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.