Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
500 Ws Owner Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Bryan Management Llc, Great Expectations, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File Sent to R/C Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
JUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE NATIONAL REGISTERED AGENTS INC. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT C176 - LETTER TO. JACOB A BROWN REQ. REOPEN FEE. USER ID=MANNTI Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT ROPEN - CASE REOPENED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT C1100 - LETTER FROM REGISTERED AGENT. USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=CUSHMAN Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.