Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rose Acceptance Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Perez-Tinsley, Quisella, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Arnold, D. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED FINANCIAL HISTORY Fund Date Invoice Interface Amount GLActivity Description F05276 09/22/2010 _______ F0003221 ____13538.00 Credit 09-CA-027563 F05276 09/30/2010 _______ J0000218 ________0.94 Credit Investment P Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
UNCLAIMED FUNDS SENT TO DEPT OF FINANCIAL SVC PER FS 717.113
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE'S COST ADVANCE FROM COURT REGISTRY Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC File in transit to the Record Center Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CIRCUIT CIVIL
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.