Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gmac Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Mosher, Donna L, Mosher, Geoffrey K, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CD612 - JUDGMENT OF DISM (AFTER HRG).. APRIL 15, 2011 JUDGE D.M. SISCO. USER ID=WHALEY Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL HEARING APRIL 15, 2011 @ 9:30A.M. @ HONORABLE JUDGE D.M.SISCO. USER ID=WHALEY Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
February 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DEFAULT FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT 02/03/10 MS. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT USER ID=DIGGSL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED DONNA L MOSHER; GEOFFREY K MOSHER. USER ID=DIGGSL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE USER ID=DIGGSL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=DIGGSL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF REPLEVIN RETURNED SERVED MOSHER, DONNA L. 11/23/09. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DONNA L. MOSHER 11/23/09. USER ID=MANNTI Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.