Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, Na As Trustee On Behalf Of The Ace Securities Corp Home Equity Loan Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Martinez, Kim C, Martinez, Corby R, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT Destruction Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER LETTER SENT TO ELIZABETH R. WELLBORN. USER ID=GARCIAWI Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RTURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS 02/22/11 ST. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE H. LEE FUTCH. USER ID=WHALEY Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO - FOR VACATE FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT,DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION,DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS AND ORDER TO DIRECT CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS. USER ID=WHALEY Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.