Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bay Gulf Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Rowe, Barbara, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Barton, M. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES REASONABLE. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT SECOND VERIFIED PETITION FOR ATTY FEES. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT PLTF RECOVER FROM DEFT 0/120/10 JMB. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 01/20/10 AT 9:00 AM. USER ID=BLACKMANJU Judge: Barton, M. James |
|
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Barton, M. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.