Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U.S.Bank National Association.Dept Foreclosure Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mckay, Cepeda, Mckay, Vivian, Beard, Willie R, Beard, Karen P, Usf Federal Credit Union, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Wolfe, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF STAY Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07-23-2013 @ 9:00 AM / ORDERED 05-14-2013 PAL Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE SMITH HIATT & DIAZ RE: RETURN OF ORIGINAL LOAN DOCS RETURNED 11/2/2010. USER ID=HUDSONAL Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER SMITH HIATT & DIAZ PA. USER ID=VECSEY Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
September 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT C176 - LETTER TO. SMITH HIATT REQUESTING REOPEN FEE. USER ID=WARRENB Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
August 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
August 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT ROPEN - CASE REOPENED. USER ID=CUSHMAN Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL ORDER VACATING SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT RETURNING ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND DISMISSING W/O PREJ 08/12/10 MJC. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
August 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO VACATE SUMMARY FJ /RETURN ORIG DOCS/DISMISS SUITE W/O PREJUDICE. USER ID=WARRENB Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE DOS 5/20/10. USER ID=DAVISCR Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.