Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Lvnv Funding Llc, Jones, Ysa R.S, Jones, Heneriette Yvonne, Bank Of America, National Association, Asset Acceptance Llcc O Bornman, Yolanda, Ra, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Pendino, D. Sam presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT Destruction Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS LOST INSTRUMENT AFFIDAVIT (WITH ATTACHMENT) Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal is in transit to the Record Center Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO SHAPIRO, FISHMAN & GACHE, LLP mas Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
|
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER Returned Lost Instrument Affidavit(with attachment) to Shapiro,Fishman & Gache, LLP 4/3/12 SDP Judge: Pendino, D. Sam |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.