Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Companymaria Mignosa, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Grey, Roberto, Grey, Dora, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc1901 E Voorhees St., Ste. C, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File Sent to R/C Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL Kurt 727 581 2552 public view Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE NOT FOUND
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
BID INFORMATION SHEET
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Fee Worksheet
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.