Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Suntrust Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Albritton, Nancy E, Albrtitton, Wally, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with SANDRA TAYLOR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: December 14, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
UNCLAIMED FUNDS SENT TO FINE & FORFEITURE ACCT PER FS 116.21
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED TO AN ELECTRONIC FILE Paper converted electronically and destroyed in accordance with minimum standards for image reproduction in Rules 1B-26.0021 and 1B-26.003, Florida Administrative Code and Record (master) copy requirements set forth in Section 92.29, Florida Statutes Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE TO: RONALD R WOLFE & ASSOCIATES, PO BOX 25018, TAMPA, FL 33622 (MOTION) PER ORDER SIGNED ON 07/28/14 BY ST Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING REOPEN FEE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE; CANCEL NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS AND SETTING ASIDE FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMNET AND DIRECTIN CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCS AND SUBSTITUTE PHOTOSTATIC COPIES IN COURT FILE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED $50 FEE ASSESSED
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL SALE CANCELLED
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE DOS 08/08/14 AM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.