Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Co, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, Ponce, Juan, College Chase Homeowners Assn Inc, Ponce, Susana, Dept Of Housing And Urban Development400 N Tampa St Ste 3200, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Wolfe, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT Destruction Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT RECEIPT OF DOCUMENT. USER ID=WOODYARDMA Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER ALBERTELLI LAW PO BOX 23623 TAMPA, FL 33623. USER ID=VECSEY Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL ORDER GRANTING MTN TO DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE 07/12/11 MJC. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.