Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Nac O President, Vp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, Donahoe, Kelli, Donahoe, Patrick, Damian, Rick, Wyndham Lakes Homeowners Assn Inc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT Destruction Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in transit to the Record Center Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER ORIG NOTE AND MORTGAGE MAILED TO: SHAPIRO FISHMAN & GACHE LLP 4630 WOODLAND CORP BV STE 100 TAMPA FL 33614 PER ORD SIGNED 01/09/12 DMS Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.