Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Countrywide Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Lovett, Delores A, Lovett, Derrick A, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED FINANCIAL HISTORY Fund Date Invoice Interface Amount GLActivity Description F06298 11/01/2011 _______ F0003546 _____1350.00 Credit 09-CA-023313 F06298 11/02/2011 _______ F0003547 ____25650.00 Credit 09-CA-023313 Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 02-NOV-2011,$17051.00, User Id = CARVALHORE, Receipt No = 2140089. USER ID=CARVALHORE Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 02-NOV-2011,$9011.50, User Id = CARVALHORE, Receipt No = 2140086. USER ID=CARVALHORE Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 01-NOV-2011,$1000.00, User Id = CARVALHORE, Receipt No = 2139682. USER ID=CARVALHORE Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 01-NOV-2011,$70.00, User Id = CARVALHORE, Receipt No = 2139479. USER ID=CARVALHORE Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.