Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Suntrust Mortgage Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Madray, Jeremiah, Boyette Creek Hoa Inc, Madray, Vadewatie, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED TO AN ELECTRONIC FILE Paper converted electronically and destroyed in accordance with minimum standards for image reproduction in Rules 1B-26.0021 and 1B-26.003, Florida Administrative Code and Record (master) copy requirements set forth in Section 92.29, Florida Statutes Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Fee Worksheet
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
BID INFORMATION SHEET
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.