Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jpmc Specialty Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Boltze, Lynn-Marie, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Wolfe, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT Destruction Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
May 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJ. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE BEN-EZRA & KATZ RE: RETURN OF ORIG LOAN DOCS. USER ID=HUDSONAL Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
March 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE BEN-EZRA & KATZ RE: RETURN OF ORIG LOAN DOCS. USER ID=HUDSONAL Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.