Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Christiana Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Curtiss, James Michael, Country Place Community Assn Inc, Curtiss, Lucinda Sue, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC AS PART OF FILE RELOCATION PROJECT Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
UNCLAIMED FUNDS SENT TO DEPT OF FINANCIAL SVC PER FS 717.113
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED FINANCIAL HISTORY Fund Date Invoice Interface Amount GLActivity Description F07960 10/18/2012 _______ Y0000777 ___103600.00 Credit 09-CA-011220 F07960 10/31/2012 _______ J0000246 ________4.29 Credit Investment P Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO AMEND ORDER/SURPLUS TRUSTEE'S / EXHIBIT ATTACHED Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON SURPLUS TRUSTEE'S MOTION FOR AMENDED ORDER Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
COPY OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE'S PETITION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.