Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vanderbilt Morgage And Finance Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Jarrard, Diana R, Dalton, Dawn, Mhc Operating Limited Partnership, Oaks At Countrywood, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Stephens, Scott. Steven presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 24, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=TRIPLETT Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
July 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=BLACKMANJU Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
July 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE. USER ID=BLACKMANJU Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DIANA R. JARRARD 6/11/09. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DAWN DALTON 6/11/09 POSTED SERVICE. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 10-JUN-2009,$30.00, User Id = HIPSON, Receipt No = 1589344. USER ID=HIPSON Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X1 (CC OF REPLEVIN ORDER) SENT TO PROCESS SERVICE OF AMERICA IN ENVELOPE PROVIDED CK 23707. USER ID=HIPSON Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X2 (CC REPLEVIN ORDER) FORWARDED TO BAY AREA PROCESS CK 23706. USER ID=HIPSON Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 05/20/09 RCS. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE JASON A BURGESS. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.