Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Neito, Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Stephens, Scott. Steven presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CONFIRMATION OF NEW LEAD ATTORNEY - FLYNN LAVRAR, ESQ. Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CONFIRMATION OF NEW LEAD ATTORNEY - FLYNN LAVRAR, ESQ. Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED e-serve@zakheimlaw Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
E-FILED MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISMISSING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISSOLVE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND DEMAND FOR STATUTORY PAYMENT Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED J P MORGAN CHASE BANK 02/22/2017 Judge: Stephens, Scott. Steven |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.