Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
James, Malcolm, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Doughty, Kay, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Silver, C. Bernard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=TURNERJE Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE NATHANIEL W TINDALL II. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PROVIDE WORK-PRODUCT EXPECTED ON INTENDED FOR USE AT TRIAL. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR TO PROVIDE WORK-PRODUCT EXPECTED OR INTENDED FOR USE AT TRIAL. USER ID=BLACKMANJU Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES USER ID=BLACKMANJU Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO VIDEO TAPE PHYSICAL EXAMINATION. USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.