Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marzolph, Nancy A, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Target Corp, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Silver, C. Bernard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
DO NOT ENTER ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS USER ID=MARTNEZ |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=LYNN |
|
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT USER ID=MARTNEZ |
|
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TARGET CORPORATION 05/02/09. USER ID=MARTNEZ |
|
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET USER ID=MILLSL |
|
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS USER ID=MILLSL |
|
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES USER ID=MILLSL |
|
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X1. USER ID=MILLSL |
|
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 30-APR-2009,$310.00, User Id = MILLSL, Receipt No = 1560130. USER ID=MILLSL |
|
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT USER ID=MILLSL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.