Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jp Morgan Chase Bank, National Association, Successor By Merger To Chase Home, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Motrib, Mohssin, Habti, Naima, Christiana Trust, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED MOHSSIN MOTRIB 10/23/12 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED HCSO CK 1153390 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION-GRANTED Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE FROM SALINA B KLINGHAMMER Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED $50 FEE ASSESSED
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.