Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Rivera, George, Countryway Homeowners Assn Inc, Hillsborough County, Clerk Of Court, Hillsborough County, Floridapo Box 1110, Suntrust Bank, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Arnold, D. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJ. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJ TENANT 1 TENANT 2 TENANT 3 AND TENANT 4. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.