Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Enfinger, Coryn, Enfinger, Joshua, filed a(n) Civil case against Arndt, Michael Henry, L J Michaels Inc, Arndt, Laura, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Barton, M. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
March 05, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL | |
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT USER ID=GRAHAMD |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY 10/12/11 THR 10/28/11. USER ID=VIRGILS |
|
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT MICHAEL HENRY ARNDT; LAURA ARNDT AND LJ MICHAEL'S INC/AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. USER ID=GRAHAMD |
|
June 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT C353 - ORD RMVNG FROM TRIAL CALENDAR . 06/07/11 JMB. USER ID=MANGUALLI |
|
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
REPORT MEDIATOR'S 05/19/2011. USER ID=MALLARDJ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.