Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Meadowood Condo Assn Inc, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case against Gallagher, Kristin T, U.S.Bank Trust,N.A., As Trustee Forf Lsf8 M.P.T., in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Silver, C. Bernard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeLiens |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM BY DEFAULT Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 2/16/12 AT 9 AM Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.