Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Florida Department Of Revenuepo Box 3342, Young, Michael G, Frederick, Douglas Creston, Groover, Melody Lee, Lloyd, Yvonne, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED DOREEN LYVERS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING NOT. W/ RTN OF SERVICE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON DEFT/TENANT DORREN LYVERS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION AND REQUEST FOR 90 DAY NOTICE TO VACATE - GRANTED 07/08/13 JRP Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC File returning to R/C; Boxed 6/24/13 in R/C Pick-up area. Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION AND TO REQUEST 90 DAY NOTICE TO VACATE 6/20/13 PAL Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CIRCUIT CIVIL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL Emergency Motion Div. M (Andre) Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION AND REQUEST FOR 90 DAT NOTICE TO VACATE FROM SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST PURSUANT TO THE PROTECTING TENANTS AT FORECLOSURE ACT FILED BY TENANT Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.