Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Green Tree Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Goldberg, Nancy, Goldberg, Eric, Hamptons At Brandon Condo Assoc, Ocean Bank, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsom, R. Claudia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER ORIGINAL NOTE ORIGINAL MORTGAGE 12/7/2010 JRP. USER ID=HUDSONAL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL ORDER VACATING SUMMARY FINAL JDUGMENT RETURNING ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND DISMISSING SUIT WITHOU PREJ 12/7/10 JRP. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO VACATE SFJ, RETURN ORIGINAL DOCS AND DISMISS SUIT W/O PREJUDICE. USER ID=SOMERSEL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO VACATE SFJ/RETURN ORIGINAL DOCS/DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE. USER ID=WARRENB Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL ORDER VACATING SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT RETURNING ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND DISMISSING SUIT W/O PREJ 11/22/10 RS. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.