Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bean, Stephanie, Stephenson, Ronald Shane, Iii, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against South Florida Fence Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsom, R. Claudia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File Sent to R/C |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS | |
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING DFDT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION / MAY 7, 2013 / 10:15 AM |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED AS TO COURTROOM NUMBER) 5/7/13 10:15AM DFTD'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION, ROOM 524 |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 05/07/13 AT 10:15 AM 03/25/13 MS |
|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING AUGUST 17, 2012 10AM |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING APRIL 19, 2012 11:30AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.