Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Hencke, Lori D, Hencke, Edward, Walden Lake Property Owners Assn Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiv M, Senior Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE LORI D HENCKE EDWARD HENCKE CERTIFICATE OF SALE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
BID INFORMATION SHEET
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Fee Worksheet
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE BUSINESS OBSERVER Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE NO PUBLICATION LISTED Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.