Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citifinancial Suto Corp, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Harris, Willie J, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE CIRCUIT CIVIL NEW DISPOSAL IN TRANSIT TO RC Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
PLURIES SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO CLERK FROM LAYLA K MCDONALD Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT STATEMENT OF GOOD COUSE SHOWING WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR 9/14/11 MS. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED X1. USER ID=WIGGSJ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 06-SEP-2011,$10.00, User Id = WIGGSJ, Receipt No = 2109011. USER ID=WIGGSJ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FRIDAY 28TH OCTOBER 2011 9:00A.M. @ JUDGE D.M. SISCO. USER ID=WHALEY Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.